Financial history THE POTTERS HOUSE (MANCHESTER)

Charity number: 1093961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £46.22k £29.71k £42.90k £33.97k £21.44k
Total expenditure £45.17k £31.57k £38.11k £38.30k £15.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A