Financial history ST JUST & DISTRICT COMMUNITY SPORTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1094476
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £56.44k £51.38k £57.71k £61.31k £48.18k
Total expenditure £56.80k £59.39k £56.49k £56.43k £41.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.50k £4.00k £4.00k £2.00k £27.89k