ANIMAL CANCER TRUST

Charity number: 1094779
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £5.94k £23.21k £17.04k £56.33k £28.79k
Total expenditure £32.93k £31.36k £19.44k £44.68k £39.58k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A