THE CHRISTIAN MEDITATION TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 1101900
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £88.32k £87.31k £325.22k £66.88k £103.09k
Total expenditure £77.11k £67.22k £94.46k £84.50k £217.29k