THE CHRISTIAN MEDITATION TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 1101900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD EDDLESTON Trustee 01 June 2017
WCCM IN THE UK Recently registered
THE SAGE TRUST Received: On time
Richard Broughton Trustee 12 November 2017
WCCM IN THE UK Recently registered
Michael John Reid MA FCA Trustee 10 October 2018
WCCM IN THE UK Recently registered
Rosalind Evelyn Stockley Chair 06 March 2018
WCCM IN THE UK Recently registered
ELIZABETH MARY WATSON Trustee 27 June 2018
WCCM IN THE UK Recently registered
Penelope Brighid Weston Trustee 28 October 2020
THE BRECON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE Received: On time
WCCM IN THE UK Recently registered
Jill Goulding Trustee 30 March 2020
WCCM IN THE UK Recently registered