HOMELESS ACTION RESOURCE PROJECT

Charity number: 1098126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.99m £3.46m £2.55m £4.08m £4.32m
Total expenditure £1.85m £1.94m £2.34m £2.88m £3.92m
Income from government contracts £348.55k £318.84k £432.25k £662.41k £1.08m
Income from government grants £5.00k £975.06k £0 £773.57k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £175.52k £238.36k £291.13k £339.63k £450.65k
Income - Other trading activities £144.73k £998.89k £212.37k £1.04m £642.00k
Income - Charitable activities £1.41m £2.11m £2.05m £2.70m £3.20m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.55k £681 £175 £72 £185
Income - Other £3.89k £106.83k -£2.16k £2.09k £28.19k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £23.72k £32.06k £35.07k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.77m £1.82m £2.19m £2.71m £3.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £74.83k £121.73k £149.82k £165.31k £169.05k
Expenditure - Governance £39.78k £34.74k £55.90k £94.34k £178.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0