Financial history ST. CATHERINE'S VILLAGE HALL LIMITED

Charity number: 1095139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £29.41k £26.12k £25.78k £10.93k £30.06k
Total expenditure £24.13k £32.33k £25.24k £10.55k £22.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £2.85k £24.07k