CAT WELFARE FUND (WISBECH)

Charity number: 1097808
Charity reporting is overdue by 1497 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 36 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 36 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 401 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 401 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 767 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 767 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1132 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1132 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1497 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1497 days