CAT WELFARE FUND (WISBECH)

Charity number: 1097808
Charity reporting is overdue by 1492 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £45.36k £27.10k £19.12k £10.07k £8.43k
Total expenditure £37.70k £25.00k £17.67k £13.53k £14.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A