SOMALI WELL WOMEN PROJECT

Charity number: 1097595
Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015
Total gross income £56.90k £77.69k £46.63k £53.85k £13.52k
Total expenditure £63.05k £75.19k £56.21k £48.61k £19.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.08k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0