ST GILES CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1094965
Charity reporting is overdue by 55 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £3.79k £3.79k £3.00k £2.06k £3.76k
Total expenditure £3.93k £3.93k £2.50k £1.59k £883
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A