ST MELLION PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1096379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 20 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 29 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 14 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required