COMMONWEALTH PARLIAMENTARY ASSOCIATION (UNITED KINGDOM BRANCH)

Charity number: 1095118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.33m £2.68m £2.90m £3.03m £1.50m
Total expenditure £2.34m £2.69m £2.80m £3.05m £1.48m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £464.17k
Income from government grants £1.80m N/A £824.17k £1.89m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.50m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.08m £2.68m £2.90m £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £825 £361 £1.07k £1.25k £279
Income - Other £247.41k £0 £0 £1.14m £464.17k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.07m £2.24m £2.80m £3.05m £1.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £16.62k £22.65k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £270.82k £446.80k £0 £0 £0