Accounts and annual returns ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1095045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window