Financial history ST WERBURGH'S SCHOOL SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1103019
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £8.48k £7.09k £7.33k £8.20k £3.96k
Total expenditure £11.32k £6.76k £4.72k £12.87k £3.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A