Financial history REFUGEE AID TRUST

Charity number: 1098991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £40.02k £31.47k £32.11k £21.50k £11.25k
Total expenditure £41.20k £35.82k £30.18k £8.00k £14.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A