Trustees BRITISH SAFETY COUNCIL
Charity number: 1097271

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter McGettrick | Chair | 30 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sean Sadler | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Robert Cooling | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Erman | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Gawthrop | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Ian Bucknell | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Thompson | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arun Muttreja | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Jennie Armstrong | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prasad Bangalore | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Collins | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GRIX | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA PETERS | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE WATERMAN | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip White | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.