EDMUND RICE BICENTENNIAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1098358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £641.37k £59.86k £716.99k £578.50k £582.94k
Total expenditure £1.46m £1.32m £163.82k £2.18m £960.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £171.98k N/A £130.62k £14.06k £13.26k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £469.39k N/A £586.37k £564.44k £569.69k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.36m N/A £0 £2.03m £841.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds £76.65k N/A £163.82k £147.29k £118.90k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 £0 £24.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £817.37k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £108.90k
Expenditure - Other £21.90k N/A £0 £0 £0