Financial history THE PUBLIC CATALOGUE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1096185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.09m £2.03m £2.26m £2.00m £1.52m
Total expenditure £1.17m £1.98m £2.33m £1.79m £1.70m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £446.49k £624.86k £500.00k £379.90k £302.29k
Income - Donations and legacies £979.45k £1.91m £2.15m £1.86m £1.36m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £18.75k £37.50k
Income - Charitable activities £107.99k £118.29k £107.48k £126.73k £124.74k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £27 £64 £107 £52 £231
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.88m £2.21m £1.67m £1.59m
Expenditure - Raising funds £67.46k £94.92k £114.71k £119.62k £116.70k
Expenditure - Governance £9.36k £9.54k £8.54k £9.19k £9.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0