REACHOUT YOUTH

Charity number: 1096492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 22 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 05 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download