Financial history BRITISH KERALITES ASSOCIATION (BKA)

Charity number: 1108424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £19.01k £17.70k £9.00k £16.32k £6.76k
Total expenditure £15.83k £16.34k £8.30k £14.23k £2.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £250 N/A