Financial history CALLINGTON TOWN BAND

Charity number: 1096165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £2.45k £4.46k £1.90k £698 £1.22k
Total expenditure £1.86k £4.51k £2.04k £1.67k £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A