Financial history SHELTERBOX TRUST

Charity number: 1096479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.23m £12.36m £11.81m £12.55m £13.98m
Total expenditure £11.89m £13.74m £15.86m £12.75m £11.46m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £257.51k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.31m £11.73m £11.24m £11.90m £13.64m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £114.00k £162.00k
Income - Charitable activities £714.47k £574.78k £522.08k £386.00k £133.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £80.27k £15.22k £24.69k £25.00k £9.00k
Income - Other £125.97k £44.82k £30.90k £132.00k £29.00k
Income - Legacies £519.58k £721.21k £819.33k £1.12m £1.42m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.86m £9.49m £11.04m £8.93m £8.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.03m £4.25m £4.81m £3.81m £3.12m
Expenditure - Governance £13.10k £13.00k £0 £17.00k £27.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.63m £1.70m £1.74m £1.70m £644.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0