Trustees SHELTERBOX TRUST

Charity number: 1096479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Thomas Horan Trustee 03 March 2022
None on record
Hakeem Olayinka Babalola Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Rowan Johnson Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Leo Skyner Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Karl Shuker Trustee 19 March 2020
DOCTORS OF THE WORLD UK
Received: On time
michelle jeuken Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record
claire goudsmit Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record
james sinclair taylor Trustee 11 June 2014
None on record
RICHARD BLAND Trustee 10 September 2013
None on record
WILLIAM DECKER Trustee 09 April 2013
None on record