Financial history INTERNATIONAL AGENCY FOR THE PREVENTION OF BLINDNESS

Charity number: 1100559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.38m £5.53m £2.52m £2.16m £2.29m
Total expenditure £10.08m £7.63m £8.62m £4.23m £2.25m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £75.78k £21.10k £12.74k £1.95k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £246.67k £453.88k £286.95k
Income - Charitable activities £6.15m £5.30m £2.14m £1.69m £1.96m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £110.35k £132.85k £122.14k £11.35k £1.15k
Income - Other £50.45k £74.90k £0 £0 £42.65k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.93m £7.48m £8.46m £4.07m £2.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £154.80k £144.65k £158.39k £158.00k £0
Expenditure - Governance £145.63k £746.35k £413.85k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £8.14m £5.79m £0 £2.15m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0