ST MARY'S WESTERHAM HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1096839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £10.04k £11.52k £18.00k £16.59k £8.88k
Total expenditure £289 £3.46k £6.00k £2.44k £3.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A