BELMONT PARISH HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1098406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £38.28k £29.65k £30.49k £32.42k £29.06k
Total expenditure £29.24k £25.69k £32.00k £38.53k £34.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £4.00k £13.90k