100 BLACK MEN OF LONDON

Charity number: 1105904
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £20.46k £39.19k £28.93k £32.64k £37.88k
Total expenditure £13.53k £21.77k £20.95k £22.64k £31.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A