Voices From Care Cymru

Charity number: 1108430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £301.52k £518.10k £505.97k £526.96k £659.41k
Total expenditure £289.01k £458.95k £480.18k £495.04k £626.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £15.80k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £165.08k £294.48k £288.65k £265.77k £359.50k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £20 £700 £3.01k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £508.79k £502.55k £521.50k £653.39k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £112 £107 £124 £135
Income - Other N/A £9.20k £3.29k £4.64k £2.87k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £458.95k £480.18k £495.04k £626.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.30k £4.11k £2.61k £4.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0