THE SIR EDMUND DAVIS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1097046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £21.95k £22.39k £24.45k £22.79k £23.48k
Total expenditure £23.41k £23.56k £21.58k £20.60k £21.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A