Trustees THE SIR EDMUND DAVIS MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity number: 1097046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN DANIEL SHERLOCK | Chair | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Anna Tillyard | Trustee | 12 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Suzanne Arnold | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gervase Ianson Armishaw | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DELIA MARY COOPER | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennie Litten-Brown | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JAMES PERRETT | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA LADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.