ST MICHAEL'S SCOUTS AND GUIDES JOINT MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1097606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 November 2020 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 November 2020 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 March 2017 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required