ST MICHAEL'S SCOUTS AND GUIDES JOINT MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1097606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £10.69k £5.65k £1.61k £11.83k £6.39k
Total expenditure £6.72k £2.98k £4.82k £9.02k £3.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A