Accounts and annual returns THE LEVENFICHE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1099968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required