Financial history RELATE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity number: 1098399
Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £234.41k £227.96k £192.25k £207.78k £181.51k
Total expenditure £195.49k £213.85k £223.84k £188.06k £221.59k
Income from government contracts £35.56k N/A N/A £7.60k £780
Income from government grants £10.62k N/A N/A £29.54k £2.81k