FELIXSTOWE AREA COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1098025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Lambert Trustee 08 August 2013 None on record
Simon Jennings Trustee 19 June 2017 None on record
Caroline Hazell Trustee 30 June 2014 None on record
KEITH SALE Trustee 29 October 2012 None on record
MICHAEL OSBOURNE Trustee 18 July 2011 None on record
Robert Charles Nice Trustee 27 July 2015 None on record
Chris Versey Trustee 24 July 2017 None on record