THE KING'S GATE CHURCH (BOGNOR REGIS) LTD

Charity number: 1108556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £50.12k £43.78k £42.68k £52.17k £43.70k
Total expenditure £54.22k £51.70k £47.72k £49.59k £46.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A