THE KING'S GATE CHURCH (BOGNOR REGIS) LTD

Charity number: 1108556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 December 2016 On time Download