Financial history ST MARIES PARENTS TEACHERS & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1098038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £6.37k £6.03k £4.36k £4.34k £2.12k
Total expenditure £6.02k £4.65k £1.23k £7.91k £7.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A