GOJAM DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION IN BRITAIN (GDAIB)

Charity number: 1097589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £20 £35 £40 £105 £35
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £35
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A