Financial history WORKING FAMILIES

Charity number: 1099808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.41m £1.03m £1.07m £981.75k £958.50k
Total expenditure £1.39m £971.89k £1.06m £786.31k £965.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £209.00k £216.25k £171.73k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £727.89k £440.30k £451.41k £454.32k £288.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £101.78k £78.96k £25.50k £0
Income - Charitable activities £533.16k £483.58k £540.61k £470.85k £589.16k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £146.81k £0 £0 £31.08k £81.22k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £871.29k £998.95k £741.52k £911.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £308.27k £100.60k £58.25k £44.79k £53.98k
Expenditure - Governance £385.15k £9.65k £6.38k £7.57k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0