THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH BARNARD CASTLE

Charity number: 1097736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required