THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH BARNARD CASTLE

Charity number: 1097736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.72k £3.24k £4.25k £8.37k £6.78k
Total expenditure £6.18k £1.64k £3.08k £7.10k £3.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A