BARBROOK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1098196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 November 2020 Annual return not yet received
Accounts and TAR 25 November 2020 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 25 November 2019 26 April 2021 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 25 November 2018 26 April 2021 579 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 25 November 2017 23 March 2021 910 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 25 November 2016 18 October 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 November 2016 Not Required