BARBROOK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1098196
Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 25/11/2015 25/11/2016 25/11/2017 25/11/2018 25/11/2019
Total gross income £1.21k £1.86k £2.62k £4.54k £2.73k
Total expenditure £1.33k £3.74k £2.57k £2.89k £1.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A