Financial history STUDENTS FOR KIDS INTERNATIONAL PROJECTS

Charity number: 1099804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £98.95k £52.69k £93.59k £35.67k £17.41k
Total expenditure £48.23k £56.29k £51.96k £40.18k £14.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A