Financial history EVOLVE HOUSING + SUPPORT

Charity number: 1099051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.32m £13.50m £13.21m £13.85m £13.47m
Total expenditure £12.92m £12.14m £13.40m £13.62m £15.59m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £2.45m £2.55m
Income from government grants £2.59m £2.60m £2.90m N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £369.06k £404.19k £610.93k £986.18k £275.50k
Income - Other trading activities £273.51k £232.09k £107.69k £23.48k £14.11k
Income - Charitable activities £12.23m £11.80m £12.44m £12.82m £13.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.62k £17.90k £48.60k £19.90k £13.98k
Income - Other £447.22k £1.05m £6.10k £192 £1.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.15m £11.61m £12.42m £13.19m £15.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £220.08k £184.14k £172.78k £195.42k £110.00k
Expenditure - Governance £37.76k £37.65k £42.53k £31.22k £33.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £558.72k £348.85k £805.48k £232.85k £194.99k