Trustees EVOLVE HOUSING + SUPPORT

Charity number: 1099051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Perkin Chair 24 January 2019
None on record
Michael Derek Ward Trustee 31 October 2022
None on record
Evonne Coleman-Thomas Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Paul Louis Infield Trustee 24 January 2019
None on record
Diana Coman Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Simon McGrath Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Isabel Lee Trustee 14 February 2016
None on record