INSPIRE AT ST PETER'S

Charity number: 1106693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexandra Loydon Trustee 12 February 2019
JAMES ALLEN'S GIRLS' SCHOOL Received: On time
COUNCILLOR LORRAINE LAUDER Trustee 28 January 2016
THE NEW AYLESBURY TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
SOUTHWARK CHARITIES Received: On time
NICHOLAS WEEDON Trustee
FRIENDS OF WINDMILL GARDENS Received: On time
PETER DOUGLAS CHADWICK Trustee None on record
Robert John Smeath Trustee 27 May 2015
UNIVERSITY OF BIRMINGHAM GUILD OF STUDENTS Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WATERLOO Received: On time
Rev ANDREW DENIS PAUL MOUGHTIN-MUMBY Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, WALWORTH Recently registered
ST PETER'S YOUTH CENTRE Received: On time
ST PETER'S WALWORTH SICK AND POOR FUND Received: On time
Gbolahan Biodun Oluwole Trustee 28 October 2015 None on record
Theophilia Shaw Trustee 01 December 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, WALWORTH Recently registered
Rev ALAN WILD Trustee None on record