CARNFORTH AND DISTRICT TWINNING ASSOCIATION IN ASSOCIATION WITH SAILLY SUR LA LYS

Charity number: 1103426
Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 37 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 37 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 February 2020 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 February 2020 467 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 February 2020 832 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required